Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patino Arrellano, Erica, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sullivan, Robert W, against Does 1 To 20, White Mountain Trucking, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Buchwald, Gerald J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 10, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: November 10, 2020Case Management Order
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint
Date: April 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE COMPLAINT |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer. | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order CMC 11/13/20 Case Management Order CMC 11/13/20 |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing CMC 11/13/20 Affidavit of Mailing CMC 11/13/20 |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.