Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Benitez Beltran, Lisbeth, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Arestides Alvarado, Jose, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Franchi, Don presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFranchi, Don Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Modifying: Child Custody and Visitation Receipt of FCS report Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Modifying: Child Custody and Visitation Receipt of FCS report Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES Reason: ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN-UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | FCS Report submitted to the Court | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
FCS Recommending Counseling - Regular
Judge: Esver-Poon, Samantha |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.