Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nancy J. Zamora Chapter 7 Trustee For The Bankruptcy Estate Of Saeid Faal, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Cascio Vince, Kay Alex, Zoveidat Soheyla, Nancy J. Zamora Chapter 7 Trustee For The Bankruptcy Estate Of Saeid Faal, represented by Hornbuckle James Dixon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Jessica A. Uzcategui presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant); Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: BV033376; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 27, 2020Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed BV033376; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: As to: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 09, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 18, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 18, 2019Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Soheyla Zoveidat)
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Alex Kay)
Date: September 24, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: October 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 17, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set Aside Order Granting M...)
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 22, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: November 22, 2019Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: December 19, 2019Objection (name extension) - Objection Defendants' Objection to Trial Setting of Non-Jury Trial
Date: December 23, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: January 03, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 07, 2020Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: January 07, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 10, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 10, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: January 16, 2020Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 21, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: January 23, 2020Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: January 23, 2020Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 23, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 27, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice to Appear at Trial and Production of Documents
Date: January 28, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice to Appear at Trial and to Produce Documents at Trial
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Non-Jury Trial; ...)
Date: February 10, 2020Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Writ of Possession of Real Property
Date: February 13, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings in the Alternative Shortening Time for O...)
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: March 02, 2020Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 04, 2020Notice of Limited Scope Representation - Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Stay of Execution)
Date: March 20, 2020Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Stay of Execution
Date: March 20, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: March 27, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: April 09, 2020Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: May 05, 2020Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed BV033376
Date: October 28, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant); Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Alex Kay (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Vince Cascio (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: As to: Soheyla Zoveidat (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: 03/20/20 BV033376; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.