Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Grigoryan Anzhela, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mercedes Benz Usa Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Richard F. Walmark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 10, 2019Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 10, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement
Date: August 14, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/10/2019
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: October 10, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/10/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.