Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tony Toutouni Dba Dba Beverly Hills Exotic Collection Llc And Beverly Hills Exotic Collection Llc, Toutouni Individually Tony, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pirnia Ardy Esq., against Blumer Aviation Llc, Blumer Individually Clyde Merrill, Clyde Merrill Blumer Dba Dba Gem Aviation, Gem Aviation An Unknown Business Entity, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions215 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Notice of Default Prove-Up Hearing)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 03, 2023Complaint
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 18, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 24, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A SHORT THIRTY-DAY CONTINUANCE
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 30, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: March 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ASA YASHAR, ESQ.
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 01, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 10, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ASA YASHAR, ESQ.
Date: August 12, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 15, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: December 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: July 22, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 09, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150 ...)
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO CLYDE MERRILL ...)
Date: November 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 11, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 30, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 31, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: June 23, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 15, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 24, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MOHAMMAD MAAZ, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO DEFAULT DEFENDANT
Date: October 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: December 28, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: January 10, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MOHAMMAD MAAZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF EXPRESS CONSENT
Date: January 26, 2023Order - Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MOHAMMAD MAAZ, ESQ.
Date: February 23, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT))
Date: February 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: February 28, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION
Date: March 14, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: April 14, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING))
Date: April 21, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MOHAMMAD MAAZ, ESQ.
Date: June 06, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 06, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: TONY TOUTOUNI, individually (Plaintiff); TONY TOUTOUNI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by TONY TOUTOUNI, individually, et al. on
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: TONY TOUTOUNI, individually (Plaintiff); TONY TOUTOUNI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Sharean Masso (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Proposed Default Judgment)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Mohammad Maaz, Esq. Filed by: TONY TOUTOUNI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Declaration Declaration; Filed by: TONY TOUTOUNI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 05/22/2019)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re The Courts Order To Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount of $500.00 Ag...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment or,...))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re the Courts Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Order to Show Cause Re: Re...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiff's Request for a Short Thirty-Day Continuance)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Does 1 through 100, inclusive))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Asa Yashar, Esq.)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default) of 07/22/2021)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Asa Yashar, Esq. in Favor of Default Against Gem Aviation)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Asa Yashar, Esq. In Favor of Default Against Gem Aviation)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Asa Yashar, Esq.)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Asa Yashar, Esq. in favor of default against Gem Aviation)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Tony Toutouni in Support Application For Default Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...))
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Tony Toutouni In Support Application For Default Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the amount of $ 150 ...))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of default as to Clyde Merrill ...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.