Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Dominguez Jasmine Lynn Aka Jason Luis Dominguez, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Michael B. Harwin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 06, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity
Date: August 06, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 20, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jasmin Lynn Dominguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jasmine Lynn Dominguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Jasmin Lynn Dominguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jasmin Lynn Dominguez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Petition for Change of name, Recognition of Change of Gender, and Issuance of New Birth Certificate
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certificate
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: September 20, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.