Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wild Iris Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Nussbaum Lane, against Lorenzana Manfredo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Huey P. Cotton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey P. Cotton Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time199 days |
Order striking mechanics lien; Signed and Filed by: Wild Iris, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: October 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wild Iris, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Manfredo Lorenzana (Respondent)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 15, 2019Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: April 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF ORDER STRIKING T...)
Date: September 05, 2019Order - ORDER STRIKING MECHANICS LIEN
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION)
Date: November 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other hearing on Mechanics Lien))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Order (striking mechanics lien)
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Order Striking t...))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution))
Date: November 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.