Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez, Avigael filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Chil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
MINUTE ORDER 01/23/2020
Date: January 23, 2020NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 12/31/2019
Date: December 31, 2019DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 12/31/2019
Date: December 31, 2019DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2019
Date: December 31, 2019DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2019
Date: December 31, 2019DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 01/10/2020
Date: January 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.