Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fox Jr, Michael filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with WATSON, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Chil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 01/21/2020
Date: January 21, 2020MINUTE ORDER 01/21/2020
Date: January 21, 2020DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 03/03/2020
Date: March 03, 2020DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 12/31/2019
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 02/11/2020
Date: February 11, 2020ACCEPT - WATSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 01/21/2020
Date: January 21, 2020DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 02/11/2020
Date: February 11, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.