Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Uemura Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kim Kandice L., Martin Cecilia Lenore, Moos Damian Michael, against Aero Precision, Core Corporation Co. Ltd, Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, Farrar Aerospace Llc, Miyano Tomoyuki, (total of 5) See All represented by Devkar Andrew V, Hand Benjamin Kaplan, Neufeld Matthew Brandon, Samaniego Angelica Acosta, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management272 days |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint is filed by Uemura Corporation against Tomoyuki Miyano, Core Corporation Co., Ltd., and Does 1-50. Uemura Corporation alleges several causes of action, including misappropriation of trade secrets, intentional interference with contract...
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Summons on Amended Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Errata to Motion to Set Aside Void Order; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Tomoyuki Miyano (Defendant); Core Corporation Co., LTD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Inability to Meet and Confer; Filed by: Farrar Aerospace, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Tomoyuki Miyano (Defendant); Core Corporation Co., LTD (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff); UTI Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Farrar Aerospace, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tomoyuki Miyano (Defendant); Core Corporation Co., LTD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Farrar Aerospace, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer; Filed by: Uemura Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 16, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 22, 2019Application - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 19, 2019Application - SECOND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 30, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 27, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: April 06, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VOID ORDER
Date: May 06, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE VOID ORDER
Date: May 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE VOID ORDER
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 29, 2020Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: July 24, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: July 31, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 23, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 22, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER
Date: February 24, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY RE MEET AND CONFER
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 28, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: May 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER
Date: June 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 28, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 28, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 30, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FARRAR DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANGELICA SAMANIEGO ISO FARRAR DEMURRER TO SAC
Date: August 12, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS
Date: February 17, 2022Answer - FARRAR AEROSPACE, LLC’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 05, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 07, 2023Separate Statement
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Related Case
Date: May 24, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS RELATING CASES AND ADJUSTING SCHEDULE
Date: June 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Application ( For an Order Extending The Time to Serve Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Application for an Order Extending the Time to Serve Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00SECOND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause))
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Alexander B. Gura in Support of Motion to Set Aside/Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion to Set Aside/Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Damian M. Moos in Support of Motion to Set Aside/Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order continuing Order to Show Cause) of 04/06/2020)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Alexander B. Gura in Support of Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Damian M. Moos in Support of Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Declaration of Damian M. Moos In Support of Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Response (to Order Show Cause re: Failure to Prosecute Case; Declaration of Damian M. Moos)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st) (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline; [Proposed] Order
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of New Hearing Date for Uemura Corporation's Motion to Set Aside Void Order)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Protective Order)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party re Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Angelica Samaniego ISO Farrar Demurrer to SAC)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (Regarding Inability to Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Farrar Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00FARRAR AEROSPACE, LLC?S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 30, 2019Application - SECOND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 19, 2019Application - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 22, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2019Complaint
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 16, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.