Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mitchell Christopher, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Bower David, against Mitchell Peter, represented by Capozzola Damian D, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions186 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time314 days |
Amended Complaint; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Declaration of Damian D. Capozzola; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Reply In support of demurrer to first amended complaint; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Christopher Mitchell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Peter Mitchell (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Reply (In support of demurrer to first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Order (STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT CCP ¿472(a))
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice (of hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Joint Stipulation Re Continuance of Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Joint Stipulation Re Scheduling And Continuance Of Case Management Conference And Proposed Order
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Damian D. Capozzola)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Damian D. Capozzola Re Compliance With Meet and Confer Requirement)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT PETER MITCHELL TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTOPHER MITCHELL
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Stipulation)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing on Demurrer Of Defendant Peter Mitchell To Complaint of Christopher Mitchell)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration of Damian D. Capozzola re Compliance with Meet and Confer Requirement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Peter Mitchell, ind. and as trustee 's Hearing on D...))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Status Conference re: closu...))
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to the Entire Action)
Date: November 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.