Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Drinkwater Michele, Fiduciary Trust International Of California, Rubin Jason, Sheinbein Robert, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Humphrey David Vreeland Jr, Merideth Frank Eugene Jr, against Jack Arian And Associates, The 2012 Arian Family Llc, Yi David, represented by Hogan Steven L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2019 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time324 days |
Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2022Order
Date: December 15, 2022Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Clarification of Order dated 10/17/2022
Date: October 21, 2022Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - Opposition (Oppositions)
Date: October 24, 2022Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)
Date: October 24, 2022Ex Parte - Order - Set for Hearing
Date: October 25, 2022Ex Parte - Order - Denied without Prejudice
Date: October 25, 2022Notice - Ruling
Date: October 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 02, 2022Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - Ex Parte Opposition (No Fee)
Date: October 26, 2022Declaration - Supplemental Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (Declarations)
Date: October 26, 2022Minute Order - - taken under submission (Ex-Parte)
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 03, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2022Notice - Notice of Dismissal of Pending Petitions
Date: November 15, 2022Notice - Notice of Continued Court Ordered Mediation (Comment)
Date: December 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2023Notice - Notice of Continued Court Ordered Mediation (Comment)
Date: January 17, 2023Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - B325107
Date: January 26, 2023Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - B325107
Date: April 04, 2023Notice - Notice of Errata
Date: April 07, 2023Notice - Hearing - 6/30/23
Date: April 11, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: May 09, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Petition To Compel Transfer of Funds; Proof of Service ) Filed by Attorney |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Petition Hearing - Held - Continued Petition Hearing - Held - Continued |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Amended and Verified Opposition to Petition to Compel Transfer of Funds ) Filed by Interested Party |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (- ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion (Motion to Strike the Dr. Sylvia and Jack Arian Foundation's Opposition to Petition to Compel Transfer of Funds (Motions) ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.