Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Timberlake Clarence, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by O'Dea Kathleen Maureen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara R. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2019 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2019Joinder
Date: May 03, 2019Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2019Response - Response to Objection
Date: June 17, 2019Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: July 15, 2019Miscellaneous Document - Mediation Statement.
Date: July 19, 2019Brief - Mediation Brief
Date: July 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2019Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: September 03, 2019Miscellaneous Document - Correction of Title of Petition
Date: September 03, 2019Miscellaneous Document - Beneficiaries Approval of Settlement (8)
Date: October 04, 2019Declaration - Re: Reconciling 7/29/19 M.O. With MSC
Date: October 25, 2019Order - Approving Settlement of Trust Litigation
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order (Approving Settlement of Trust Litigation ) | |
December 06, 2019 | Order - Approving Settlement of Trust Litigation | ||
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order (Approving Settlement of Trust Litigation ) | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Re: Reconciling M.O. With MSC ) Filed by Attorney |
|
October 25, 2019 | Declaration - Re: Reconciling 7/29/19 M.O. With MSC | ||
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Re: Reconciling 7/29/19 M.O. With MSC ) Filed by Attorney |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Johnson Barbara R. |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.