Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ally Bank A Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Krugliak Bentzion D, against Gonsalves An Individual Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: September 24, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum Deficiency Memo; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Ally Bank, a corporation on
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ally Bank, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 30, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 30, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 30, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance
Date: May 01, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: August 25, 2020Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Deficiency Memo
Date: September 24, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: September 24, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020Judgment - Judgment Judgment
Date: October 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.