Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Geico Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Paulus Cherie, against Harris Caroline Beattie, Toutouni Farzad Tony, represented by Richards Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Default entered as to FARZAD TONY TOUTOUNI; On the Complaint filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY on
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Maggie Boxx; Filed by: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 11, 2022Request for Dismissal; Filed by: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Publiclation re: Caroline; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 25, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CAROLINE BEATTIE HARRIS (Defendant); As to: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY on
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 27, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 27, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 27, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: November 27, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 24, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 17, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: June 09, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Maggie Boxx
Date: June 09, 2020Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: June 10, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: July 15, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 21, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: May 26, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 01, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: July 07, 2021Judgment - Judgment Judgment Proposed
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 11, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Publiclation re: Caroline; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Maggie Boxx; Filed by: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CAROLINE BEATTIE HARRIS (Defendant); As to: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.