Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Edward B. Moreton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward B. Moreton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: December 02, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: December 02, 2019Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: December 23, 2019Motion for Reconsideration - Motion for Reconsideration
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: March 23, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/5/20)
Date: April 22, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)
Date: June 10, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: August 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.