Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amica Mutual Insurance Company A Corportion, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Haines Todd F., against Chaheme Yessenia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Amica Mutual Insurance Company, a corportion (Plaintiff)
Date: March 25, 2022Complaint - Complaint
Date: October 16, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: October 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 16, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 16, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 04, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 12, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: April 16, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Response to Dismissal Date
Date: July 27, 2021Order (name extension) - Order re Continuing Dismissal Date After Settlement
Date: July 29, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE OF OSC
Date: August 13, 2021Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: January 07, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement;)
Date: March 24, 2022Judgment - Judgment By Stipulation
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: March 25, 2022Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: May 05, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 04/14/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.