Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fernandez Lakeisha, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Westlake Services Llc. Dba Westlake Financial Servcies Llc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Westlake Services, LLC. On the Complaint filed by Lakeisha Fernandez on
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant); As to: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Application; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: September 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 16, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 16, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 30, 2020Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: January 28, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: March 03, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case
Date: March 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 14, 2020Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion for Application
Date: April 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/24/2020
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 09/24/2020
Date: September 24, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing
Date: September 25, 2020Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)
Date: December 07, 2020Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant); As to: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lakeisha Fernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Application; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.