Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Credit Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hagopian Shant Harout, against Gunn Burshay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a verified complaint for possession of personal property and damages filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC against Bershay Gunn and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges that Defendants purchased a 2013 Harley Davidson FLHTC a...
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 22, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: August 22, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 22, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: September 12, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 23, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuation of Hearing
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 21, 2019Other - (name extension) - Other - Decision on application for writ of possession: granted
Date: January 16, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: January 24, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 09, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: July 06, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Other - Decision on application for writ of possession: granted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.