Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gill Kimisha, Shannon Paige, Shannon Wendy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nwabuzor Emmanuel, against Demirjian Lilit, Shannon Paige, Shannon Wendy, represented by Ogunnubi Melissa, Santos Patrick Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Windham Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions374 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Default entered as to LILIT DEMIRJIAN; On the Complaint filed by KIMISHA GILL on
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KIMISHA GILL on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: June 18, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: June 18, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: June 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 24, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: June 24, 2020Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 24, 2020Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint
Date: June 30, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: June 30, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 30, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: December 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2020
Date: December 15, 2020Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order To Set Aside Entry of Default
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: December 15, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: January 07, 2021Answer - Answer
Date: January 19, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: June 03, 2021Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: August 05, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)
Date: June 16, 2022Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Default entered as to LILIT DEMIRJIAN; On the Complaint filed by KIMISHA GILL on 06/18/2019
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KIMISHA GILL on 06/18/2019, Default entered on 06/26/2020, Vacated - .
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Lilit Demirjian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.