Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robart Randall, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gonzales Marlon, represented by Brown Samantha Story, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Randall Robart (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Randall Robart (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: April 29, 2021First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: April 17, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: April 17, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: April 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 17, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: July 15, 2019Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: September 03, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/04/2020
Date: September 04, 2020Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)
Date: April 27, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: April 29, 2021Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Randall Robart (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Randall Robart (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Marlon Gonzales (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.