Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maya Jose, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Friedman Nathaniel, against Adams M.D. Fred Aka Fraidon Babanejadyanghedjen, Chlb Llc Dba College Medical Center, Clinica Sierra Vista Exact Business Form Unknown, College Medical Center Exact Business Form Unknown, St. Mary'S Hospital Of Long Beach Exact Business Form Unknown, (total of 7) See All represented by Lucas Amanda M., Pleiss Larry Thomas, Taggart Deborah, Weber John J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Of Pleiss In Support Of MSJ; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Appellant)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant); As to: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of MSJ; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration of Trial Counsel; Filed by: CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant); Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B312798); Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 23, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 02, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: February 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL
Date: March 09, 2020Answer
Date: March 09, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 09, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 16, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: March 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO STATE COURT PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. SECTION 233(L)(1)
Date: March 20, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 02, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 02, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 06, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: April 06, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 07, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT-ORDERED CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE, ETC.
Date: April 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEMURRER
Date: April 22, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA IN FIRST PAGE OF COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION
Date: May 18, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 20, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLEISS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 21, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 27, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: May 27, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: June 05, 2020Answer
Date: June 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 16, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 19, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/19/2020
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: November 23, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D.’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) (DR....)
Date: December 03, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A.’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: December 01, 2020Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING & NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 11, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 23, 2020Answer
Date: January 19, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 18, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 14, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: May 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: May 25, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: May 28, 2021Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: September 21, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: May 03, 2022Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED (B312798)
Date: August 23, 2022Notice (Notice to State Court Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 233(l)(1)) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: December 30, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 30, 2019Complaint
Date: December 30, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration (of Trial Counsel) Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant); Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata In First Page of Complaint) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of MSJ) Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Pleiss In Support Of MSJ) Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff); Jose Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Motion re: (for Priority in Trial Settings) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed ((B312798)) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 23, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (Dr....)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling & Notice of Trial) Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant); Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Giselle Maya (Appellant)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Jasmine Cruz); Hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Giselle Maya (Appellant)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Fred Adams, M.D. (Defendant); Jasmine Cruz, M.A.(Doe 151) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: May 06, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE MSJS
Date: May 14, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Giselle Maya (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by CHLB, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Trial Counsel)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Giselle)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice to State Court Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 233(l)(1))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling Hearing on Demurrer)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice (of Court-Ordered Continuance of Demurrer and Motion to Strike, etc.)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata In First Page of Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Reply (Reply To Opposition)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendant Hospital's Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Pleiss In Support Of MSJ)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/21/2020)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of MSJ)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S [COMBINED SINGLE OPPOSITION] TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/11/2020)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike by Defendant Jasmine Cruz, M.A.)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion re: (for Priority in Trial Settings)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Pl...))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Priority in Trial Settings)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling & Notice of Trial)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (Dr....))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION STRIKING PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/19/2020)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MUHONEN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A.'S MSJ)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D.?S REPLY BREIF IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Portions of the Declaration of Michael Muhonen, M.D.)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MUHONEN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D.'S MSJ)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Plaintiff?s Counsel?s Request for Review of Denial of Request for Accommodation
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, MA?S REPLY BREIF IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/03/2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/10/2020)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.