Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jung Thomas, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Parnell Stephen, against Bmw Of North America Llc, Finchey Corporation Of California Dba Pacific Bmw, represented by Amir Abtin, Chan Garrick Y., Hom Brian Ming, Weddle Lisa Rose, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 27, 2019Complaint
Date: December 27, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 09, 2020Answer
Date: February 05, 2020Answer
Date: February 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 11, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 04, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 06, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ABTIN AMIR
Date: July 08, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 16, 2020Reply - REPLY RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: December 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 11, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: January 13, 2021Order - FINAL RULING RE: MOTION TO FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: January 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: January 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 02, 2021Answer; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant); As to: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Reply Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; Filed by: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Finchey Corporation of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Finchey Corporation of California (Defendant); As to: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Abtin Amir; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Thomas Jung (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Final Ruling Re: Motion to for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Finchey Corporation of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: January 21, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Reply (Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: February 02, 2021Answer Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Thomas Jung (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Finchey Corporation of California (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Abtin Amir) Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Sherri Rangel in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Abtin Amir)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Stephen Parnell in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Stephen Parnell in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Requesting the Court Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Reply (Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Adam Zolonz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.