Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Abouzar Nahid, Kohavi Ezra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cronk Anna H, Greenslade Michael Vincent, Vanderpool Douglas, Vanderpool Douglas B., against Abouzar Nahid, Kohavi Ezra, Schmeltz Ronnie M, represented by Esposito Amber Danielle, Holmberg Brian D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael E. Whitaker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Plaintiff); As to: Ezra Kohavi (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant); As to: Ezra Kohavi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant); As to: Ezra Kohavi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ezra Kohavi (Plaintiff); As to: Ronnie M Schmeltz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ezra Kohavi (Defendant); As to: Nahid Abouzar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ezra Kohavi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: Ezra Kohavi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Order [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant); As to: Nahid Abouzar (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 11, 2022Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nahid Abouzar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: December 16, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 16, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 23, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 09, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 18, 2020Answer
Date: February 18, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: June 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: June 16, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: September 03, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 20, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 05, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: April 16, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL AUTHORIZATIONS TO RELEASE MEDICAL...)
Date: February 07, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 11, 2022Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of )
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel AUTHORIZATIONS TO RELEASE MEDICAL...))
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel AUTHORIZATIONS TO RELEASE MEDICAL...) of )
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Case Numbers 19STCV44776 and 20ST...))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing for Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/03/2020)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement) of 09/17/2020)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing for Defendant's Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Case Numbers 19STCV44776 and 20ST...))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.