Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Santibanez Madahi, Santibanez Marcelino, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Lovasz Christopher, against General Motors Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Win Chevrolet Inc. A California Corporation Dba Win Chevrolet Hyundai, represented by Major Cameron, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time232 days |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 04, 2019Complaint
Date: December 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 15, 2020Answer
Date: February 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION
Date: March 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/10/2020
Date: April 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Cameron Major (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Madahi Santibanez (Plaintiff); Marcelino Santibanez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Cameron Major (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Win Chevrolet, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice ( of Change of Address or Other Contact Information)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/10/2020)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.