Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Smith Ronnie Lee, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mejia John Villagran, against Magic Mountain Llc, represented by Amaro Michael Lee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Answer
Date: January 10, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 19, 2021Motion to Bifurcate
Date: May 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 19, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice Notice of Order to Continue Trial; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant); As to: Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: August 15, 2022Complaint Filed by Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial) Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Ronnie Lee Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Continue Trial) Filed by Magic Mountain LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate (TO BIFURCATE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AT TRIAL;)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate) of )
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date and Final Status Conference Date)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate (TO BIFURCATE ISSUES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AT TRIAL;)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.