Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C., Stoll Nussbaum & Polakov Apc, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Rowley Nicholas Charles, Stoll Jr. Robert J., Stoll Robert John, against Coleman Victor, Everidge Deanna, Hansel Gary, Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C., Hudson Pacific Properties Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Mcgarrigle Patrick, Mcgarrigle Patrick Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management100 days |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 10, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 10, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 19, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 08, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: January 08, 2020Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK C. MCGARRIGLE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 08, 2020Reply (Demurrer FAC) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of MTC Hearing Time) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Reply (Motion to Strike FAC) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of MTQ Hearing Time) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Quash Subpoena) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena; Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Hudson Pacific Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hudson Pacific Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Strike SAC) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (Hudson Opposition to MTC Form Rogs (Hrg )) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: June 30, 2022Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to MTQ TIS Subpoena) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Cont. Hearings to ) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Reply (ISO Demurrers to SAC) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate (Consent and Certification) Filed by Honorable Judge Gerald Rosenberg (Ret.) (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Patrick C. McGarrigle in support of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoenas)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or ORDER)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2020)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/16/2020)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to MTQ TIS Subpoena)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Reply (Demurrer FAC)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Motions Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Reply (Motion to Strike FAC)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Quash Subpoena to TIS Construction Services)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena; Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration ISO Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of MTC Hearing Time)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling of MTQ Hearing Time)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (Hudson 11601Wilshire LLC [Combined] to SNP's Motions to Compel Further Discovery Responses)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 17, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: February 07, 2020Answer
Date: February 28, 2020Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MTQ TIS SUBPOENA
Date: July 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR
Date: July 13, 2020Reply - REPLY DEMURRER FAC
Date: July 15, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 16, 2020Reply - REPLY MOTION TO STRIKE FAC
Date: July 15, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 16, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: August 12, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 13, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: August 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 01, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: September 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION ISO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 09, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: September 09, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 09, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MTC HEARING TIME
Date: September 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MTQ HEARING TIME
Date: September 11, 2020Answer
Date: September 16, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 22, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 22, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 23, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONT. HEARINGS TO 02/01/2021
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Reply - REPLY TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: January 25, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO (3) MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM SNP
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 26, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO DEMURRERS TO SAC
Date: January 25, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION TO STRIKE SAC
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 27, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK C. MCGARRIGLE ISO (3) MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 01, 2021Case Management Order
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)
Date: February 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION HUDSON OPPOSITION TO MTC FORM ROGS (HRG 03/09/2021)
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: March 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE
Date: April 01, 2021Answer
Date: April 02, 2021Certificate - CERTIFICATE CONSENT AND CERTIFICATION
Date: April 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: February 24, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL
Date: June 30, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to MTQ TIS Subpoena; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoenas; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate Consent and Certification; Filed by: Honorable Judge Gerald Rosenberg (Ret.) (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Hudson Pacific Properties, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Opposition Hudson Opposition to MTC Form Rogs (Hrg ); Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Robert John Stoll (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoenas) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Reply Motion to Strike FAC; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Reply ISO Demurrers to SAC; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Robert John Stoll (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Reply to Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Strike SAC; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: March 03, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 12, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 23, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 03, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 03, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: April 27, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Date: May 06, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: May 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 03, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or ORDER) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Reply Demurrer FAC; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Hudson 11601 Wilshire L.L.C. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Stoll, Nussbaum & Polakov, APC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Cont. Hearings to 02/01/2021)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Patrick C. McGarrigle ISO (3) Motions to Compel)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Strike SAC)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (ISO (3) Motions to Compel Discovery Responses from SNP)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Reply (ISO Demurrers to SAC)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.