Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Compton, Reed Brianna Teresa, Lopez Liliana Azpeitia, Reed Brianna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Won Helen Esq., Yeung Michael Lung, against City Of Compton, Lafayette King, Lopez Azpeitia Doe 51 Liliana Lorena, Reed Brianna Teresa, represented by Kraft Philip Andrew, Miller Jennifer E., Westmoreland Dominique Nikko, Paz Jose R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CITY OF COMPTON (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BRIANNA TERESA REED (Defendant); As to: LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); As to: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant); As to: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); As to: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Re Notice of Related Case; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); As to: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); As to: City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: BRIANNA TERESA REED (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: CITY OF COMPTON (Defendant); As to: LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Compton (Defendant); As to: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: BRIANNA TERESA REED (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 12, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: March 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 23, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 13, 2020Answer
Date: April 13, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 28, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: March 18, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: April 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: December 12, 2022Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES
Date: December 15, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 30, 2023Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 14, 2023Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: March 14, 2023Association of Attorney
Date: March 22, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: May 22, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: May 23, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: May 31, 2023Proof of Personal Service Filed by LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Notice of Related Case) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by BRIANNA TERESA REED (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by BRIANNA TERESA REED (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Brianna Reed (Plaintiff); Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by CITY OF COMPTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by City of Compton (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Brianna Reed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CITY OF COMPTON (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by BRIANNA TERESA REED (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel) Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by LILIANA AZPEITIA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by City of Compton (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES) Filed by BRIANNA TERESA REED (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate) of 03/18/2021)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 03/18/2021)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.