Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ali Khadijah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Stricke Leslie, represented by Morris Antoinette D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 12, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: January 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: March 18, 2020Answer
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 19, 2021Request for Dismissal Filed by Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) Filed by Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Leslie Stricke (Defendant); As to: Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Khadijah Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Leslie Stricke (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.