Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VICTORIA TERESA BRIGGS VS ISABEL SERRANO RAMIREZ
On December 03, 2019 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 03, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Kristin S. Escalante;Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
June 01, 2021 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
May 18, 2021 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
February 22, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 22, 2021 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 22, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs as to the entire action |
|
February 19, 2021 | Request for Dismissal | ||
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
January 22, 2020 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
January 22, 2020 | Answer | ||
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant); As to: Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 171.40; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 13, 2019 | PI General Order | ||
December 13, 2019 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES | ||
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Kristin S\. Escalante in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse | |
December 04, 2019 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
December 04, 2019 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
December 04, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
December 03, 2019 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
December 03, 2019 | Complaint | ||
December 03, 2019 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
December 03, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Serrano Ramirez (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Victoria Teresa Briggs (Plaintiff) |
|