Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Solis Anthony, against Grossman Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 04, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 12, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 08, 2020Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: May 12, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 11, 2020Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: July 06, 2020Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MINOR'S PETITION
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF DEPOSIT
Date: March 15, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2021Complaint; Filed by: Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff); As to: Arthur Grossman (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Receipt of Deposit) Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Submission in support of Minor's Petition; Filed by: Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff); Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (Submission in support of Minor's Petition) Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Cooper Rossman (Plaintiff); As to: Arthur Grossman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.