Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Swanston Mary, Taylor & Ring Llp, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Claypool Brian, Ring David Mcdonald, Vallejos Nathalie, against Arcadia Gardens Management Corporation A Corporation, Arcadia Gardens Retirement Hotel Business Form Unknown, Chirikian David, Chirikian Julie, Giovannello Law Group P.C., (total of 7) See All represented by Giovanniello Alexander Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management280 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Continuing Motion to Compel Arbitration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Declaration Decl of M.Swanston ISO of Opp to MTC Arbitration; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Opposition Pltf OPP to MTC Arbitration; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Declaration Decl of B.Baltierra ISO Opp to MTC Arbitration; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Objection Pltf OBJECTION to Def's Evidence ISO of MTC Arbitration; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of for Department D) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B308600; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 19, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B308600, NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $409.87; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid TAYLOR & RING LLP PAID FOR RESPONDENT $259.87; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration of Mary Swanston in Support of Motion; Filed by: Mary Swanston (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Declaration (Decl of B.Baltierra ISO Opp to MTC Arbitration)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Order (Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 01/21/2020)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf OPP to MTC Arbitration)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Motion re: (for Trial Preference; Memorandum of Points of Authorities; Declaration of Brian Claypool)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - Court Order setting a Status Con...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Objection (Pltf OBJECTION to Def's Evidence ISO of MTC Arbitration)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Petition and Petition to Compel Arbitration and Motion for Stay)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration (Decl of M.Swanston ISO of Opp to MTC Arbitration)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendants Arcadia Gardens Management Corporation, Julie Chir...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Complicated ?PI? Case Transferred from S...))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order Minute Order of 8/19/2020 for Department D))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.