Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guillen Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chambers Gary Lee, against Robinson Benjamin Ray, Robinson Liana Kim, represented by Hurley Beth, Williams Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jill T. Feeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: BENJAMIN RAY ROBINSON (Defendant); LIANA KIM ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 13, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 13, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2019Complaint
Date: November 13, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 04, 2019Answer - ANSWER GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 25, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: August 25, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2022
Date: August 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by BENJAMIN RAY ROBINSON (Defendant); LIANA KIM ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by BENJAMIN RAY ROBINSON (Defendant); LIANA KIM ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by BENJAMIN RAY ROBINSON (Defendant); LIANA KIM ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by MARIA GUILLEN (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Answer (General Denial to Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.