Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Silberfein Cody, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosensweig Mitch, Schwimer Michael, against 21St Century Insurance A California Corporation Company, represented by Lemieux James P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management92 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions230 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 21st Century Insurance a California corporationCompany (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cody Silberfein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cody Silberfein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cody Silberfein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Cody Silberfein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 07, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 08, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 12, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 24, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 01, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 01, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020
Date: April 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 19, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 21, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 18, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 24, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Date: July 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RELATED CASES)
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TO BE HEARD WITH 20STCV06738)
Date: August 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TO BE HEARD WITH 20STCV06738)
Date: August 26, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Cases) of 08/18/2020)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/21/2020)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Objection (To Defendant's [Proposed] Judgment of Dismissal; Request For Sanctions)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Judgment ([PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/18/2020)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINITFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Cases))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Judgment of Dismiss...))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference to be heard with 20STCV06738))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference to be heard with 20STCV06738))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Clarification and Status of Re...))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.