Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Munkeby Joseph Milton, Vision Pacific Llc, Qualfax Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bartelstone David Scott, Howard Elmira Rezaei, Robinson Michael S., Robinson Michael, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff?S Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff?S Title Thereto, Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, Drano'S Enterprise L.L.C. A Limited Liability Company, Hansen Angela, Hanson Angela, (total of 12) See All represented by Ascherin Preston K., Benbow Shannon, Erlich Rinat Klier, Gaskins Jordan, Humphrey Janet Elizabeth, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff?S Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff?S Title Thereto
All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff?S Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff?S Title Thereto (Cross-defendant)
Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 13, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross-Complaint) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Monetary Status; Filed by: TICOR TITLE COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Disclaimer DISCLAIMER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGE; Filed by: COUNTY OF ORANGE (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Declaration of Kelli Espinoza; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: ANGELA HANSON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00; On the Cross-Complaint filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY on
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Denial of Entry of Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Zippora Williams Bochner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Default entered as to JOSEPH MUNKEBY, INC. On the Cross-Complaint filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY on
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Zippora Williams Bochner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Prestige Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Prestige Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00; On the Cross-Complaint filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY on
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Brief JOSEPH M. MUNKEBYS DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING BRIEF; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Notice Amended Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Request Appendix of Evidence ISO Default; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Continuance OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING; Filed by: VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant); New Firm Name: ATTLESEY WARD
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2019Complaint
Date: October 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 23, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: January 03, 2020Answer
Date: January 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS
Date: January 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 23, 2020Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER DISCLAIMER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGE
Date: January 23, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 28, 2020Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: February 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLI ESPINOZA
Date: February 06, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 25, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: April 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: April 13, 2020Answer
Date: April 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 21, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 29, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 04, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 26, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: June 02, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 02, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 03, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIRMING DEED OF TRUST
Date: June 10, 2020Order - ORDER CONFIRMING DEED OF TRUST
Date: June 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 23, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: July 13, 2020Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES GUZINO SYSTEMS INC
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES TO J.D. DAVIS AKA JARRELL DARNELL DAVI
Date: August 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FIDELITY FUNDING CAPITAL CORP.
Date: August 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES PRESTIGE ESCROW, INC.
Date: August 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ANGELA HANSEN
Date: August 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 12, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 12, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 20, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 25, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 31, 2020Answer
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 22, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDERS AT THE NOVEMBER 6, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: December 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: December 23, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 26, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 08, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 25, 2022Application for Publication
Date: March 02, 2022Application for Publication
Date: March 03, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 03, 2022Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR DONNY
Date: March 08, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 04, 2022Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: April 18, 2022Proof of Publication
Date: April 25, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: May 11, 2022Separate Statement
Date: May 17, 2022Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: May 17, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Publication
Date: May 26, 2022Proof of Service by Posting
Date: May 31, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 02, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: June 03, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 07, 2022Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 09, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: June 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: June 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE)
Date: June 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 27, 2022Brief - BRIEF JOSEPH M. MUNKEBYS DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING BRIEF
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHERIE MAPLES RE NONMILITARY STATUS
Date: July 27, 2022Exhibit List
Date: July 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING AS TO JOSEPH MUNKEBY, INC.)
Date: August 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 26, 2022Request - REQUEST EXHIBITS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: November 21, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 06, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY QUALFAX, INC)
Date: February 27, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 31, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 08, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 22, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 03, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: March 16, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 24, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 14, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER – CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS
Date: September 21, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 21, 2020Answer
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Pendency of Action) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (AMENDED) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages PRESTIGE ESCROW, INC.) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend cross complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Prestige Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion of Qu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Donny) Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Settlement) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) as to the Cros...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Trial Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing as to JOSEPH MUNKEBY, INC.)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing as to JOSEPH MUNKEBY, INC.; Order to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross-Complaint) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Request (Appendix of Evidence ISO Default) Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Brief (JOSEPH M. MUNKEBYS DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING BRIEF) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Espinoza) Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages ANGELA HANSEN) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Order (Confirming Deed of Trust) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status) Filed by TICOR TITLE COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Prestige Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Prestige Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Disclaimer (DISCLAIMER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGE) Filed by COUNTY OF ORANGE (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages GUZINO SYSTEMS INC) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Confirming Deed of Trust) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint) Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Deposition Testimony) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by QUALFAX, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT) Filed by VISION PACIFIC, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ANGELA HANSON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order ? Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Disclaimer (DISCLAIMER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGE)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order - Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages FIDELITY FUNDING CAPITAL CORP.)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Order (Confirming Deed of Trust)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed not entered-box on #2 was not checked off.)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages ANGELA HANSEN)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross-Complaint) of )
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (Disclaimer of the United States of America)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages GUZINO SYSTEMS INC)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elmira R. Howard in Support of Application for Publication of Donny Harrell)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Deposition Testimony)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Drano's Enterprise, L.L.C., a limited liability company)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing as to JOSEPH MUNKEBY, INC.))
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Trial Continuance))
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint Trial)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Pendency of Action)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Espinoza)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Disclaimer (by Defendant California Reconveyance Company to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (- *Probate Dept 11 has oldest case*)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF CHERIE MAPLES RE NONMILITARY STATUS)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages PRESTIGE ESCROW, INC.)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages TO J.D. DAVIS aka JARRELL DARNELL DAVI)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (of Recordation of Notice of Pending Action (Lis Pendens))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Confirming Deed of Trust)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders at the November 6, 2020 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Brief (JOSEPH M. MUNKEBYS DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Witness List (Joint Trial)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend cross complaint))
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Donny)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion of Qu...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Joseph Milton Munkeby's and Qualfax, Inc.'s Evidentiary Stipulations re Trial Exhibits
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (JOSEPH MILTON MUNKEBYS AND QUALFAX, INC.S JOINT STIPULATION OF AGREED FACTS)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Cross-Defendant and Cross-Complainant Vision Pacific LLC's Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice (of Settlement)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Cross-Complaint) of )
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Pendency of Action)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Disclaimer (DISCLAIMER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGE)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Disclaimer (by Defendant California Reconveyance Company to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Espinoza)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed not entered-box on #2 was not checked off.)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (- *Probate Dept 11 has oldest case*)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Disclaimer of the United States of America)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Confirming Deed of Trust)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Order (Confirming Deed of Trust)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages PRESTIGE ESCROW, INC.)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages ANGELA HANSEN)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages FIDELITY FUNDING CAPITAL CORP.)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages TO J.D. DAVIS aka JARRELL DARNELL DAVI)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order - Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Re Punitive Damages GUZINO SYSTEMS INC)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Protective Order ? Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders at the November 6, 2020 Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (of Recordation of Notice of Pending Action (Lis Pendens))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Drano's Enterprise, L.L.C., a limited liability company)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Donny)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elmira R. Howard in Support of Application for Publication of Donny Harrell)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.