Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alderman Tim, Hamilton Jason, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bibiyan David D., Farnaes Malte L L, Hawkins James Ross, against Michael Kors Stores California Inc., Michael Kors Usa Inc, represented by Meer Jonathan D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended; Signed and Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration of David D. Bibiyan RE: Status of Removal; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Michael Kors Stores (California), Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of December 18, 2019 Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Removal; Filed by: Michael Kors Stores (California), Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Addendum (checklist); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 16, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Of Norma Placencio Regarding Class Period; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Initial Status Conference Order
Date: October 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 07, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 03, 2019Answer
Date: December 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: December 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/18/2019
Date: December 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DECEMBER 18, 2019 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: January 02, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID D. BIBIYAN RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL
Date: June 18, 2020Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: January 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FEDERAL COURT REMAND)
Date: February 03, 2021Other - - JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 03, 2021Stipulation and Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED
Date: April 07, 2021Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: June 02, 2021Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: June 08, 2021Order - RULINGS/ORDERS; ADDENDUM (CHECKLIST)
Date: July 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS)
Date: September 24, 2021Order - RULINGS/ORDERS
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 01, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 18, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT;)
Date: January 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS;)
Date: January 18, 2022Order - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: January 24, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT;)
Date: August 16, 2022Order - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: August 16, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)
Date: August 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NORMA PLACENCIO REGARDING CLASS PERIOD
Date: January 11, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 01, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT;)
Date: February 01, 2023Order - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: February 01, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 16, 2023Judgment
Date: February 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT;)
Date: February 16, 2023Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2023Complaint Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: setting Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing First Amended Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Based on current conditions, including, but not ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (regarding emergency order issued) Based on curr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Responsive Pleading or ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Supplemental Papers)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Initial Status Conference) Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00First Amended Class Action Complaint Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of December 18, 2019 Initial Status Conference Order) Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: status of removal to federal c...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Removal) Filed by Michael Kors Stores (California), Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Michael Kors Stores (California), Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration (of David D. Bibiyan RE: Status of Removal) Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Addendum (checklist) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order Dated August 1, 2022) Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Rulings/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motion for Final App...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Supplemental Papers;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order) Filed by Jason Hamilton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: setting Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/18/2019)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice (of Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice (of Removal)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice (of December 18, 2019 Initial Status Conference Order)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (regarding emergency order issued) Based on curr...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Non-Appearance Case Review RE: Status of Removal of Federal Court)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Based on current conditions, including, but not ...))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice (of Advanced Non-Apperance Case Review RE: Status of Removal of Federal Court)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: status of removal to federal c...))
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Declaration (of David D. Bibiyan RE: Status of Removal)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Supplemental Papers))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00First Amended Class Action Complaint
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand) of 02/03/2021)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of David D. Bibiyan in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Addendum (checklist)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing First Amended Complaint))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement) of 07/07/2021)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Responsive Pleading or ...))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically at the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 03/03/2021)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Joint Report of Parties
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (for Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Supplemental Papers;))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement) of 10/01/2021)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Rulings/Orders
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.