Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shaw James, Shaw Lisa, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Maxwell Nicholas M., Vartazarian Steven R, Renner J. Robert, against Advanced Surgical Devices Inc., Velazco Frank, Wright Medical Group Inc., Wright Medical Technology Inc., Zurowski William, (total of 5) See All represented by Eli Rona, Renner J. Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management384 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions346 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Request for Dismissal; Filed by: James Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: March 17, 2023Notice (NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...) of )
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY?S DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANNE A GRUNER)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Second amended Complaint
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...) of )
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike To Plaintiffs'...))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order re Transfer and Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: imposition of sanctions against plain...))
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 3, 2022)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike To The Second ...))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...) of )
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Case Managemen...))
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: James Shaw (Plaintiff); Lisa Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Shaw (Plaintiff); Lisa Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Shaw (Plaintiff); Lisa Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Nicholas M. Maxwell (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order re Transfer and Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY?S DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.