Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Dare Jennifer, Ferris Susan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by England Brian Ray, Gresen Solomon E., Robinson Damion D, Robinson Damion D. D., against Bohemia Group Inc., Ferris Susan, represented by Sherman Richard Lloyd, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint is a class action filed by Jennifer DaRe on behalf of herself and others similarly situated against Bohemia Group, Inc., Susan Ferris, and Does 1 through 100. The complaint alleges various violations of labor laws, including failure to...
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Anywhere Posting;))
Date: December 02, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: March 02, 2022Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order Continuing IDC)
Date: June 02, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order;))
Date: January 26, 2021Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (CaseAnywhere))
Date: June 26, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 01, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Telephonic Pleading Conference;))
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Initial Status Confe...))
Date: January 23, 2020Opposition (to Motion to Quash Service of the Complaint)
Date: September 11, 2020Notice (of Court Order Regarding Continuance of Initial Status Conference)
Date: April 01, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed A...))
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance;))
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;))
Date: June 26, 2020Complaint; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff); As to: Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings;))
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference;))
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;))
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint a...))
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Order
Date: June 26, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: March 02, 2022Plaintiffs' Initial Status Conference Response Statement
Date: January 23, 2020Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Response Statement; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Susan Ferris (Cross-Complainant); As to: Jennifer Dare (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Continuance;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Court Order Regarding Continuance of Initial Status Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Initial Status Conference Response Statement; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service (CaseAnywhere); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of the Complaint; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Jennifer Dare; On the Cross-Complaint filed by Susan Ferris on
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Jennifer Dare; On the Cross-Complaint filed by Susan Ferris on
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Court Ruling and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Response of Plaintiffs' Former Counsel S. Gresen to OSC; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Status Conference Report; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Following Order to Show Cause; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Joint Statement Re: Amendment to Answer; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff); As to: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: May 04, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 13, 2022Declaration (of Defense Counsel Richard Lloyd Sherman, Esq.)
Date: January 16, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting a Telephonic Informal Conference;))
Date: February 02, 2022Defendants Susan Ferris and Bohemia Group Inc. Answer to Complaint
Date: November 20, 2020Joint Statement re: Defendants' Demand That Service of the Complaint be Quashed
Date: August 10, 2020Court Ruling and Order
Date: May 16, 2022Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference;))
Date: March 23, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deny Class Cert;))
Date: June 10, 2021Minute Order ( (Conference (Pleading)))
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on March 8, 2022;))
Date: March 10, 2022Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on May 11, 2022;))
Date: May 16, 2022Minute Order ( (Conference (Discovery);))
Date: February 23, 2022Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Jennifer Dare's Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Plaintiff And Cross-Defendant, Jennifer Dare's Answer To Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Regarding Continuance of Initial Status Conference)
Date: April 24, 2020Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deny Class Cert;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Susan Ferris (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Telephonic Pleading Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Anywhere Posting;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Discovery);)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (CaseAnywhere)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Susan Ferris (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Court Ruling and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Joint Statement Re: Amendment to Answer Filed by Jennifer Dare (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on June 22, 2022;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Receipt of Stipulation;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of PAGA Claim Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on March 8, 2022;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Susan Ferris (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Service of the Complaint) Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Informal Discovery Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order Continuing IDC) Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on May 11, 2022;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Following Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Response (of Plaintiffs' Former Counsel S. Gresen to OSC) Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Pleading);)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Regarding Continuance of Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service (CaseAnywhere))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance;) of )
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Response Statement
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Deny Class Certification)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Heard on March 8, 2022;))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Discovery);))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Motion re: (to Deny Class Certification)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings;))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Initial Status Confe...))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Defense Counsel Richard Lloyd Sherman, Esq.)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance;) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Regarding Continuance of Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance;))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Telephonic Pleading Conference;))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Pleading)))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Service of the Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Lloyd Sherman, Esq. in Support of Sanctions Request Re: Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint a...))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed A...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Anywhere Posting;))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Status Conference;))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Deny Class Certification)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting a Telephonic Informal Conference;))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion re: (to Deny Class Certification)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deny Class Cert;))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Bohemia Group, Inc. (Defendant); Susan Ferris (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Status Conference Report Filed by Jennifer Dare (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Hearing on Motion to Compel ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Initial Status Confe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Initial Status Conference Response Statement Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Response Statement Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Jennifer Dare (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting a Telephonic Informal Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference (Pleading))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.