Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doron Ronen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vaziri Siamak, against Moloshco Harry C., represented by Beaton Julie R., Kaufman Mark David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant); As to: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Defendant's Motions to Compel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limini No. 1; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Brief Defendant's deposition designation; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Plaintiff's MSC Brief; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 03, 2022Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: RONEN DORON (Plaintiff); HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: February 15, 2022Opposition Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No.1; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: HARRY C. MOLOSHCO (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice (NTC of WITHDRAWAL of MOTIONS)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Defendant's Motions to Compel) of 08/11/2020)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Defendant's Motions to Compel))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Scheduling of Motion for Order)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date (And Related Dates;)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition (Conditional) to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition, in part, to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition (Conditional) to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limini No. 1)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition (Conditional) to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (Non-Opposition (Conditional) to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's deposition designation)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.