Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bochner Zippora Williams, Woods Rosemary, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Cirlin Jason N., against Abercrombie Ernest Dejuan, Bochner Zippora Williams, Dld Properties Llc, Rad Javanshir, Raz Investments Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Bach Julian, Noudel Yossi, Razavi Leyla, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Bachner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management118 days |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Raz Investments, Inc. (Defendant); Yanni Raz Raz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff); As to: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID continuances;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Javanshir Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of , Quiet Title Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 20, 2021Updated -- Stipulation for Judgment: Filed By: Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DIMISSAL; Filed by: Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 20, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY DLD AND JAVANSHIR RAD
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 27, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2019Complaint
Date: September 27, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 01, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 11, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: October 25, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST
Date: October 25, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 30, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: December 11, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: January 06, 2020Summons - SUMMONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 14, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 16, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 31, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020
Date: March 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY RAZ INV. AND YANNI RAZ
Date: April 08, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY DLD AND JAVANSHIR RAD
Date: April 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID CONTINUANCES;)
Date: April 15, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 04, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2021Stipulation for Judgment
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 20, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2021
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DLD Propoerties, LLC (Defendant); Javanshir Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Zippora Williams Bochner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (to Cross-Complaint) Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st)) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DLD Propoerties, LLC (Defendant); Javanshir Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Filed by DLD Propoerties, LLC (Defendant); Javanshir Rad (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Zippora Williams Bochner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID continuances;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DIMISSAL) Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Quiet Title Judgment Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: July 09, 2020Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 27, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: August 21, 2020RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 08, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES)
Date: February 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL
Date: February 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Raz Investments, Inc. (Defendant); Yanni Raz Raz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal) Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendants, DLD Properties, LLC and Javanshir Rad...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Regarding Trial Procedures)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID continuances;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of , Quiet Title Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosemary Woods (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by ROSEMARY WOODS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal After Settlement as t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike by DLD and JAVANSHIR RAD)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Summons (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF YOSSI NOUDEL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ¿ 430.41 AND ¿435.5)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike by RAZ INVEST. and YANNI RAZ)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID continuances;))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID continuances;) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer by DLD and JAVANSHIR RAD)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer by RAZ INV. and YANNI RAZ)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Regarding Trial Procedures))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendants, DLD Properties, LLC and Javanshir Rad...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/27/2020)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Quiet Title Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Start Time for Hearing re Defendants Demurrers, MTX, OSC and Post Mediation Conf.)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/13/2021, Quiet Title Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Quiet Title Judgment
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Entry of Quiet Title Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint or Portions Thereof
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.