Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Howard James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Woods Christian, against Allstate Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 23, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: September 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2019Petition for Coordination
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 22, 2021Order - Dismissal
Date: March 22, 2021Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 03/08/2021)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Petition for Coordination
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.