Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcmillan Alistair, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Armour Jeffrey Alan, Herrell Matthew Brooke, against Wheels Labs Inc. A Business Entity Form Unknown Dba Wheels Technologies Inc, Wheels Labs Inc. A Business Entity Form Unknown Dba Wheels Technologies Inc., Wheels Labs Operations Inc., represented by Chang Stephanie, Deziel Colleen Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions103 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: September 19, 2019Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Wheels Labs Operations, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: December 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)
Date: April 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 15, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: April 15, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: April 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 17, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (PART 3)
Date: July 09, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (PART 1)
Date: July 09, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 09, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 17, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: August 07, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF IDC HEARING ADVANCED
Date: September 03, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: September 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE IDC
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 28, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM ROGS
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO RFP
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 05, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF COMPEL MOT RE DEMANDS 01
Date: October 06, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF COMPEL MOT 01 RE FORM INTERROGATORIES 01
Date: October 06, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 07, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX-PARTE APPLICATION
Date: October 08, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE DATE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 15, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO RFP SET TWO
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 22, 2020Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 23, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 18, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: November 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 24, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: December 03, 2020Answer
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 14, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 20, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC
Date: February 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/25/2020)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Strike FAC)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike Punitive Damages)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/19/2020)
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of IDC) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of IDC))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Ame...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses of Wheels Labs ...))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice (of IDC Hearing Advanced)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ((Amended Updated) of Confidential Documents for Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Compel Mot re Demands 01)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex-Parte Application)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Date of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidential Documents (Part 2))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Compel Mot 01 re Form Interrogatories 01)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00(Amended Supplemental Declaration) in Support of Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel protective order)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance re IDC)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Response to RFP Set Two)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Response to RFP)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Response to Form Rogs)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Date of Motion for...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidential Documents (Part 1))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidential Documents (Part 3))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE ...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Order (Order Transferring Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (PROTECTING CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS;)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff?s Opposition to Defendant?s Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Reply in Support of Compel Mot re Demands 01; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of IDC) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Opposition to motion to compel protective order; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Wheels Labs, Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Reply in Support of Compel Mot 01 re Form Interrogatories 01; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Opposition to Ex-Parte Application; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC; Signed and Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Opposition To Motion to Strike FAC; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Opposition To Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Alistair McMillan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.