Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
National Credit Control Agency Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Love Calvin F., against Bae Gung J, Deep Sea Garments Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRafael A. Ongkeko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions292 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Declaration DEC 585; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Declaration OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration DEC RE INTEREST; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by National Credit Control Agency Inc on
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: National Credit Control Agency Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by National Credit Control Agency Inc on
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 27, 2020Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: February 27, 2020Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: February 27, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND VACATING OF DATE)
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ...)
Date: October 01, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DEC 585
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY O...)
Date: December 01, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: February 17, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: February 17, 2021Default Judgment
Date: March 17, 2021Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: September 16, 2021Writ - Return
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating of Date))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry o...))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; ...))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; ...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; ...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (DEC 585)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration (DEC RE INTEREST)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; ...))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.