Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Calderon Edwin D., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mizrahi Guy, against American Honda Motor Co. Inc., represented by Ingold Trevor J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management168 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Declaration (of Malek re MTC RFP & Special Rogs)
Date: April 01, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Opposition To Motion; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Declaration of Malek re MTC RFP & Special Rogs; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition to MTC RFP; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition to MTC Special Rogs; Filed by: Edwin D., Calderon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2019Complaint
Date: September 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 09, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 27, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 10, 2019Answer
Date: October 16, 2019Case Management Order
Date: February 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MALEK RE MTC RFP & SPECIAL ROGS
Date: April 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: February 24, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 01, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 14, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MTC SPECIAL ROGS
Date: July 20, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MTC RFP
Date: July 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT AND DISCOVERY)
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 04, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/19/2021
Date: April 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2021Complaint
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/09/2020)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for confidentiality agreement)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to MTC Special Rogs)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2020)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to MTC RFP)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: status of settlement and discovery))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.