Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Litt Irving, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Castille Lenelle Esq., against Faux Finishes Inc. Dba Guerin Design & Development, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irving Litt (Plaintiff); As to: Faux Finishes, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE PETITION FOR RELEASE OF CLAIM
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 30, 2019Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR RELEASE OF CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: October 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 05, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition for Release of Claim of Lien)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Irving Litt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien Filed by Irving Litt (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Irving Litt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Irving Litt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Petition for Release of Claim) Filed by Irving Litt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Order (Re: Petition for Release of Claim of Lien) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Order (Re: Petition for Release of Claim of Lien)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice (Petition for Release of Claim)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition for Release of Claim of Lien))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.