Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Blumin Jeffrey Steven filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Manly John Clinton Esq., against Johnson Dalan Anthony, Torrance Unified School District A California Local Public Entiry, represented by Mott Jonathan, Patel Sarita, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing Guardian Ad Litem(; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Jane HC; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's motion to compel; Filed by: Los Angeles Police Department (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Heather Ptivorec, CSR 10551; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Tatiana Alvarado #13769; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Torrance Unified School District, a California local public entiry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Torrance Unified School District, a California local public entiry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application and Order for Extension of Time To Serve...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's motion to compel) Filed by Los Angeles Police Department (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Torrance Unified School District, a California local public entiry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Torrance Unified School District, a California local public entiry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: scheduling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Heather Ptivorec, CSR 10551 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Torrance Unified School District, a California local public entiry (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS, PURSUANT TO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Tatiana Alvarado #13769) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed by Jane HC Doe, a Minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Kim S. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (Guardian Ad Litem(Jane HC Doe))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application and Order for Extension of Time To Serve...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO NON-PARTY LONG BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with ...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel Re Meet and Confer for Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel re: Meet and Confer for Demurrer to SAC)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof Of Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Regarding Mental Examination of Plaintiff Jane HC Doe)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Issue, Evidentiary and/or Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff in Opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED...))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: scheduling))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FOR UNAVAILABLE WITNESSES)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC...))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan J. Mott in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Evidence in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS, PURSUANT TO...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE)))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Coordination Conference/Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE)))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Regarding Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of )
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Tatiana Alvarado #13769)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (and Order for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading - Non-Appearance)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...) of )
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel Re Meet and Confer for Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of )
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex Parte Application and Order for Extension of Time To Serve...) of )
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Order (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order - Protective Order)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Heather Ptivorec, CSR 10551
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application and Order for Extension of Time To Serve...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (and Order for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading - Non-Appearance)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (Guardian Ad Litem(Jane HC Doe))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/14/2019)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel Re Meet and Confer for Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order - Protective Order)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and closure of the pleadings; Hear...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Regarding Mental Examination of Plaintiff Jane HC Doe)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel re: Meet and Confer for Demurrer to SAC)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO NON-PARTY LONG BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with ...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: scheduling))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TUSD's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED...))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Issue, Evidentiary and/or Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff in Opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Evidence in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan J. Mott in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of TUSD Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/13/2020)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC...))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS, PURSUANT TO...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Regarding Mental Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE)))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Coordination Conference/Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (PREFERENCE CASE)))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Tatiana Alvarado #13769)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 05/20/2021)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Order (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarita T. Patel Re Meet and Confer for Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.