Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hatfield Alice, Hollinshed Bessie M., Nelson Mary By And Through Her Successor In Interest Elmer Pogue, Pogue Elmer, Pogue Lydell, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Garcia Stephen Michael, against Cha Health Systems Inc, Cha Health Systems Inc., Cha Hollywood Medical Center L.P., Chs Healthcare Management Llc, Pogue Jaqulin, (total of 6) See All represented by Alvarado Lesvia Marietta, Hester Cecille Louise, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: CHS Healthcare Management, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice OF CMC; Filed by: Mary Nelson,, by and through her Successor in Interest, Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: CHA Health Systems, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (AMENDED MINUTE ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Separate Statement AMENDED; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Declaration of Trial Attorney; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Order Final Ruling Re: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (AMENDED MINUTE ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHS Healthcare Management , LLC (Defendant); CHA Health Systems, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by CHA Health Systems, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (re: Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel Depositions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration ( of Trial Attorney) Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel PMK Deposition and Production of Documents Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition OF 1) DIANADEGRAFENREA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Furth...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling Re: Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHS Healthcare Management, LLC (Defendant); CHA Health Systems, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Requesting Additional Time to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF 1) DIANA DEGRAFENREAD, R.N...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Mary Nelson,, by and through her Successor in Interest, Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel the Deposition of the PMK of CHS Healthcare Management, LLC Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Nurse Estela Aclara...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel PMK Deposition and Production of Document Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel PMK Depo)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice ( OF CMC)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elmer Pogue)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHELIA CHESANOW)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of Trial Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Ruling-Demurrers and Motions to Strike
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Brief In Support of Consolidating Both Cases)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((AMENDED MINUTE ORDER) of )
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...) of )
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (re: Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel Depositions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mary Nelson,, by and through her Successor in Interest, Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((AMENDED MINUTE ORDER) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED) Filed by CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Ruling-Demurrers and Motions to Strike Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses And A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by CHS Healthcare Management, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Elmer Pogue (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (Amended Declaration of Lesvia M. Alvarado in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs reply to opposition to motion to compel)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel PMK Deposition and Production of Document
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Sheila Chesanow, R.N.)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (Brief to motion to consolidate related actions for all purposes)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Objection (to defendants improper and tardy oppositions to plaintiffs continued motion to compel)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiffs motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Supplemental Separate Statement re Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT CHA HOLLYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to SROG's, Set 1 and FROG's, Set 1)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULING PLAINITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Reply ( in support of plaintiffs motion to compel)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiffs motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases) of )
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (in support of plainitffs motion for summary adjudication)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Furth...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiffs notice of motion and motion further responses from defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition ( to Plaintffps MTC Further Responses for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFP, Set 1)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition OF 1) DIANADEGRAFENREA...))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses And A...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel PMK Deposition and Production of Documents
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (AMENDED MINUTE ORDER))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (plaintiffs evidence in support of motion for summary adjudication)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating and Other Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Supplemental Separate Statement re Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling Re: Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions;))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Lesvia Alvarado re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Production, Set One)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINITFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHA HOLLYWOOD)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF RNs)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel Depositions
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Separate Statement (Amended)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION OF FAROUKH KERENDI, M.D.)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Nurse Estela Aclara...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Requesting Additional Time to...))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Ruling-Motion to Compel the Deposition of the PMK of CHS Healthcare Management, LLC
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF 1) DIANA DEGRAFENREAD, R.N...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Requesting Additional Time to Produce Documents)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgeable of CHS Healthcare Management)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Reply (of Def CHA Hollywood's to Pltf's Opposition to Def Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Reply (plaintiffs reply to defendant cha hollywood)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR ISSUE)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (PROOF OF SERVICE VIA OVERNIGHT DELIVERY)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF WILLIAM M. ARTIGLIERE REGARDING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (of Def CHA Hollywood's to Pltf's Motion to Compel Deposition of F Ara RN, Etc.)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Opposition (plaintiffs opposition to defendant cha hollywood)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiffs motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to SROG's, Set 1 and FROG's, Set 1)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Opposition ( to Plaintffps MTC Further Responses for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Reply ( in support of plaintiffs motion to compel)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses And A...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((AMENDED MINUTE ORDER) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (AMENDED MINUTE ORDER))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Brief In Support of Consolidating Both Cases)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (Brief to motion to consolidate related actions for all purposes)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/05/2020)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice (plaintiffs evidence in support of motion for summary adjudication)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/20/2020)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (in support of plainitffs motion for summary adjudication)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULING PLAINITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/05/2020)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFP, Set 1)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Objection (to defendants improper and tardy oppositions to plaintiffs continued motion to compel)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Lesvia Alvarado re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Production, Set One)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Reply (in support of plaintiffs motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Furth...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases) of 07/10/2020)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court?s Sua Sponte Motion to Consolidate Cases))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Supplemental Separate Statement re Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Supplemental Separate Statement re Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT CHA HOLLYWOOD MEDICAL CENTER)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Respo...))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling Re: Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF RNs)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition OF 1) DIANADEGRAFENREA...))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINITFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHA HOLLYWOOD)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Requesting Additional Time to Produce Documents)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Separate Statement (Amended)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Requesting Additional Time to...))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF 1) DIANA DEGRAFENREAD, R.N...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating and Other Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions;))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION OF FAROUKH KERENDI, M.D.)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Nurse Estela Aclara...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of the Person Most Knowledgeable of CHS Healthcare Management)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Reply (of Def CHA Hollywood's to Pltf's Opposition to Def Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Opposition (of Def CHA Hollywood's to Pltf's Motion to Compel Deposition of F Ara RN, Etc.)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (plaintiffs opposition to defendant cha hollywood)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR ISSUE)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Reply (plaintiffs reply to defendant cha hollywood)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF WILLIAM M. ARTIGLIERE REGARDING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elmer Pogue)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (Amended Declaration of Lesvia M. Alvarado in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (re: Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice ( OF CMC)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/25/2019)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Declaration ( of Trial Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHELIA CHESANOW)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel PMK Depo)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiffs notice of motion and motion further responses from defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs reply to opposition to motion to compel)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Sheila Chesanow, R.N.)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/11/2019)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (PROOF OF SERVICE VIA OVERNIGHT DELIVERY)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Separate Statement (Amended)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
September 07, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
September 07, 2021 | Hearing | ||
September 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Final Status Conference (Notice of settlement/unconditional filed ) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference (Notice of settlement/unconditional filed 7/26/21) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding Final Status Conference (Notice of settlement/unconditional filed 7/26/21) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Theresa M. Traber |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.