Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jackson Donna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ahmad Mohamad S., against Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. Dba Princess Cruises Dba In Alaska As Denali Princess Wilderness Lodge, Transamerica Casualty Insurance, represented by Conner Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: August 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 09, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 09, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 01, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER)
Date: March 09, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 23, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF L. CONNER ISO MTN TO DISMISS
Date: March 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020
Date: April 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 28, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: July 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FEDERAL CASE)
Date: October 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (In Chambers Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Declaration of L Black ISO Mtn to Dismiss; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Declaration of L. Conner ISO Mtn to Dismiss; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((In Chambers Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: July 21, 2020Complaint Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration ( of L. Conner ISO Mtn to Dismiss) Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration ( of L Black ISO Mtn to Dismiss) Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Forum Non C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Donna Jackson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Federal case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: October 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((In Chambers Court Order) of 03/09/2020)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Declaration ( of L. Conner ISO Mtn to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration ( of L Black ISO Mtn to Dismiss)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Forum Non C...))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.