Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Herrera Alfredo, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Elihu Kaveh Sam, against Hilbert Mark Dba Hilbert Property Management, Hilbert Property Management, represented by Hunter Aileen M., Hunter Aileen Marie, Nelson Rhonda Louise, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: August 02, 2019Order Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff); As to: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mark Hilbert (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mark Hilbert (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mark Hilbert (Defendant); As to: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Witness List JOINT; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff); Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff); Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Exhibit List PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Exhibit List PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case JOINT SHORT STATEMENT OF CASE; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kaveh Sam Elihu (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 02, 2019Complaint
Date: August 02, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 15, 2019Answer
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 20, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 26, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: December 04, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 04, 2019Answer
Date: December 23, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, HILBERT PROPERTY MANAGEMEN...)
Date: November 30, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 25, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 04, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: March 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 12, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 12, 2021Order - ORDER RULING
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 27, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/27/2021
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 30, 2021Trial Brief
Date: October 01, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO MIL NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF MARK HILBERT'S PRIVILEGED NOTES
Date: October 01, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO MIL NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY
Date: October 01, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 07, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: October 14, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: October 08, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 19, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: November 01, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: November 15, 2021Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE JOINT SHORT STATEMENT OF CASE
Date: November 15, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 15, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: November 15, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 21, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 01, 2022Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Hilbert's Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mark Hilbert (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel; Filed by: Hilbert Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Alfredo Herrera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Bifurcate Punitive Damages at Trial)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Hilbert Property Managemen...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Second Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/12/2021)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR DEFENSE MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF ALFREDO HERRERA)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order (Ruling)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for ...))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to Exclude Evidence of its Intent to Violate Wage and Hour Laws)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 To Exclude Evidence Not Produced In Discovery)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/27/2021)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Reply (iso MIL No. 11 to Exclude all Evidence of Mark Hilbert's Privileged Notes)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Reply (iso MIL No. 6 to Exclude Evidence not Produced in Discovery)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply iso MIL No. 7 to Exclude Video of Depositions taken by Plaintiff's Counsel Himself)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Exhibit List (PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation Regarding Motions in Limine)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Exhibit List (PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case (JOINT SHORT STATEMENT OF CASE)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12 [of 12] to Bifircate Planitiff's Equitable Claims from His Legal Claims)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/19/2022)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion To Compel)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Hilbert Property Managemen...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories and Employment Interrogatories, Set One.
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Stipulated Ex Parte Application to continue Trial and All Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 04, 2021Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.