Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Homesite Insurance Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Graham Bruce, against Brasscraft Manufacturing Company, represented by Baldino Ryan Walter, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management103 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 02, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 02, 2019Complaint
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 13, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 15, 2019Answer
Date: September 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Order
Date: November 13, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES
Date: November 13, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 21, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: 998 OFFER;)
Date: October 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT
Date: October 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brasscraft Manufacturing Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: October 27, 2020Answer Filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: 998 Offer;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Deposit of Jury Fees) Filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: 998 Offer;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: 998 Offer;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Deposit of Jury Fees)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.